1.2 BASIC MULTIPLICATION (WHOLE NUMBERS)

Helpfulness: +2
Set Details Share
created 10 years ago by jncanf
1,538 views
Chapter 1: Mathematics Members of the health professions use math every day to calculate medication dosages, radiation limits, nutritional needs, mental status, intravenous drip rates, intake and output, and a host of other requirements related to their clients. Safe and effective care is the goal of all who work in the health professions. Therefore it is essential that students entering the health professions be able to understand and make calculations using whole number, fractions, decimals
updated 10 years ago by jncanf
Grade levels:
College: First year, College: Second year, College: Third year, College: Fourth year
show moreless
Page to share:
Embed this setcancel
COPY
code changes based on your size selection
Size:
X
Show:
1

VOCABULARY:

THE ANSWER TO A MULTIPLICATION PROBLEM IS CALLED?

PRODUCT

2

BASIC MULTIPLICATION (WHOLE NUMBERS):

EXAMPLE: 23 X 5 =

STEPS:
1. MULTIPLY ONE DIGIT AT A TIME.
2. MULTIPLY 5 X 23:
*ONES: 5 X 3 = 15
**CARRY THE 1 TO THE TENS PLACE, AND WRITE THE 5 IN THE ONES PLACE.
*TENS: 5 X 2 = 10 + 1 = 11

ANSWER: 115

3

BASIC MULTIPLICATION (WHOLE NUMBERS):

EXAMPLE: 623 X 45 =

STEPS:
1. MULTIPLY 623 X 5.
*5 X 3 = 15
*5 X 2 = 10 + 1(CARRIED OVER) = 11
*5 X 6 = 30 + 1(CARRIED OVER) = 31(NO NEED TO CARRY OVER)
2. MULTIPLY 623 X 4(REMEMBER TO LINE UP THE ONES DIGIT WITHT HE 4 BY USING ZERO AS A PLACEHOLDER)
*4 X 3 = 12
*4 X 2 = 8 + 1 = 9
*4 X 6 = 24
3. ADD THE TWO PRODUCTS TOGETHER.
* 115 + 24,920 = 28,035(THE FINAL PRODUCT)

4

BASIC MULTIPLICATION (WHOLE NUMBERS):

EXAMPLE: 301 X 451 =

STEPS:
1. MULTIPLY 301 X 1.
*1 X 1 = 1
*1 X 0 = 0
*1 X 3 = 3
2. MULTIPLY 301 X 5.
*5 X 1 = 5(REMEMBER TO USE A ZERO FOR A PLACEHOLDER)
*5 X 0 = 0
*5 X 3 = 15
3. MULTIPLY 301 X 4.
*4 X 1 = 4
*4 X 0 = 0
*4 X 3 = 12
4. ADD THE THREE PRODUCTS TOGETHER.
*301 + 15,050 + 120,400 = 135,751 (THE FINAL PRODUCT)

5

PRACTICE:

846 X 7 =

5,922

6

PRACTICE:

325 X 6 =

1,950

7

PRACTICE:

653 X 12 =

7,836

8

PRACTICE:

806 X 55 =

44,330

9

PRACTICE:

795 X 14 =

11,130

10

PRACTICE:

999 X 22 =

21,978

11

PRACTICE:

582 X 325 =

189,150

12

PRACTICE:

9438 X 165 =

1,557,270

13

PRACTICE:

JAN IS PREPARING AN EXAMINATION FOR 29 STUDENTS. EACH STUDENT WILL HAVE 30 QUESIONS, WITH NO STUDENT HAVING DUPLICATE QUESTIONS. HOW MANY QUESTIONS WILL JAN NEED TO PREPARE?

870

14

PRACTICE:

JOHN IS ORDERING LUNCH FOR THE VOLUNTEERS AT THE HOSPITAL. THERE ARE 12 UNITS IN THE HOSPITAL, WITH 15 VOLUNTEERS IN EACH UNIT. HOW MANY LUNCHES WILL JOHN NEED TO ORDER?

180